Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 15:26:24 (UTC).

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY VS SHAWNAN CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHAWNAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0885

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Defendants

SHAWNAN CORPORATION

ELECNOR BELCO ELECTRIC INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUNOZ J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/29/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/29/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company on 01/29/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/05/2020; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shawnan Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/05/2020; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shawnan Corporation (Defendant); Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shawnan Corporation (Defendant); Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shawnan Corporation (Defendant); Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELECNOR BELCO ELECTRIC INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAWNAN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUNOZ J.