This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 19:04:11 (UTC).

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY VS PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8960

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Defendants

ARB INC.

PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUNOZ J. SAL

Defendant Attorney

HEFFERNAN KEVIN NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/22/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/22/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

2/16/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Answer - Answer

3/9/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); ARB, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON: As To Parties changed from Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff) to Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON; Signed and Filed by: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); ARB, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company on 10/22/2020, Default entered on 12/03/2020, Vacated - Court Ordered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company on 10/22/2020, Default entered on 12/03/2020, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: ARB, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Primoris Services Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: ARB, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/23/2020; Service Cost: 91.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/23/2020; Service Cost: 81.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); ARB, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); ARB, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff); As to: Primoris Services Corporation (Defendant); ARB, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEFFERNAN KEVIN N. ESQ.