Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2019 at 03:14:53 (UTC).

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0840

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK EVAN A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/3/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/21/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/22/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/22/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Evan A. Clark (Attorney): First Name changed from Evan to Evan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAddress for Evan A. Clark (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation on 11/21/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LOHAS FRESH MART-ALHAMBRA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 11/22/2019 to 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 11/22/2019 to 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 11/22/2019 to 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOHAS FRESH MART ALHAMBRA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK EVAN ALEXANDRA