This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 03:15:01 (UTC).

PACIFIC ALLIED ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS SOYOUNG SOY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PACIFIC ALLIED ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOYOUNG SOY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1568

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC ALLIED ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

SOY SOYOUNG

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/25/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/25/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pacific Allied Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Soyoung Soy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Soyoung Soy (Defendant) to Soyoung Soy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Pacific Allied Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Pacific Allied Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less