This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:10:10 (UTC).

OZUNA, R JESUS VS SANCHEZ, RAMIRO C

Case Summary

On 09/16/2015 OZUNA, R JESUS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHEZ, RAMIRO C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY YERKEY and MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7904

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY YERKEY

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OZUNA R JESUS

Defendants

SANCHEZ RAMIRO C INDIVIDUAL AND JULIZ ENTERPRISES

SANCHEZ RAMIRO C

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable

10/13/2017: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

9/29/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/29/2017

9/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/29/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing - Other LAW AND MOTION RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT)

9/29/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing - Other LAW AND MOTION RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT)

Notice of Appeal

12/17/2015: Notice of Appeal

Minute Order

12/14/2015: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/14/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($0.00)

11/19/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($0.00)

RETURNED MAIL

10/2/2015: RETURNED MAIL

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/16/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

1/27/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]

8/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]

Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings

8/22/2017: Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable; Filed by: Clerk; As to: RAMIRO C SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing - Other LAW AND MOTION RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Hearing - Other LAW AND MOTION RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Hearing - Other LAW AND MOTION RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION 1952{D} CCP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. AMY YERKEY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • MARY REPASS SWORN AS INTERPRETER FOR PLAINTIFF, (OZUNA, R JESUS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/14/15 . FOR (OZUNA, R JESUS) . AGAINST (SANCHEZ, RAMIRO C) INDIVIDUAL AND (JULIZ ENTERPRISES) . PRINCIPAL $ 3000.00 . COSTS $ 75.00 . TOTAL $ 3075.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SANCHEZ, RAMIRO C) INDIVIDUAL AND (JULIZ ENTERPRISES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SANCHEZ, RAMIRO C) INDIVIDUAL AND (JULIZ ENTERPRISES) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SCFD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM RETURNED AS TO (OZUNA, R JESUS) DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # DOW506799011 . HEARING SET FOR 12/14/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.