This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:56:45 (UTC).

OXFORD INTERNATIONAL, INC. VS VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 OXFORD INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1904

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OXFORD INTERNATIONAL INC.

Defendants

VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC

VANOUNOU ZION

VANOUNOU MOSHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TABIBI NICO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling

2/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

Summons - on Complaint

2/2/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/2/2018: Complaint

Undertaking - Under section 489.210 CCP $10,000.00

2/2/2018: Undertaking - Under section 489.210 CCP $10,000.00

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

2/2/2018: Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/2/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) - of Yousef Shayestehfar

2/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Yousef Shayestehfar

Declaration (name extension) - of Nico N. Tabibi

2/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Nico N. Tabibi

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Nonresident)

2/2/2018: Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Nonresident)

Minute Order - (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND FOR ISSUAN...)

2/2/2018: Minute Order - (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND FOR ISSUAN...)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/2/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Nico Tabibi (Attorney): Organization Name: Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Oxford International, Inc. on 02/02/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oxford International, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vanounou Clothing, Inc (Defendant); Moshe Vanounou (Defendant); Zion Vanounou (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vanounou Clothing, Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 02/06/2018; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zion Vanounou (Defendant); Service Date: 02/06/2018; Service Cost: 15.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Moshe Vanounou (Defendant); Service Date: 02/06/2018; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND FOR ISSUAN...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Nonresident); Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vanounou Clothing, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Nico N. Tabibi; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Yousef Shayestehfar; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Oxford International, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketRight to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketUndertaking Under section 489.210 CCP $10,000.00; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OXFORD INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant