This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2016 at 07:17:22 (UTC).

OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC VS BURGOS, FELIX REGULO

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURGOS, FELIX REGULO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1140

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC

Defendant

BURGOS FELIX REGULO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDANIEL, JAMES EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • JUDGMENT AS TO THE UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DEFAULT AS TO THE UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • OSC SET 03/22/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oseguera Investment Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McDaniel, James E.