This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2020 at 10:50:33 (UTC).

OSCAR HERNANDEZ VS BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 OSCAR HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC , . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1844

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ OSCAR

Defendants

BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES INC.

1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESTNER DAVID

Defendant Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

8/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/28/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/28/2020

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE

7/21/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/8/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 07/10/2020

7/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 07/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

7/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF MICHAEL A. ABRAMSONPURSUANTTOCODEOF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2) REGARDING AUTOMATIC 30-DA Y EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF MICHAEL A. ABRAMSONPURSUANTTOCODEOF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2) REGARDING AUTOMATIC 30-DA Y EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

6/2/2020: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAddress for OSCAR HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by OSCAR HERNANDEZ on 02/25/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by OSCAR HERNANDEZ as to 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC and BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/01/2020 10:30 AM at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/24/2021 08:30 AM at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF MICHAEL A. ABRAMSONPURSUANTTOCODEOF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2) REGARDING AUTOMATIC 30-DA Y EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: OSCAR HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OSCAR HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OSCAR HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.