This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 06:14:15 (UTC).

OSCAR ARRIOLA VS CHRISTOPHER JAMES HOLDSWORTH

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 OSCAR ARRIOLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER JAMES HOLDSWORTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARRIOLA OSCAR

Defendant

HOLDSWORTH CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS

Defendant Attorney

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

6/24/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of OSC Re: Failure to File POS

7/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of OSC Re: Failure to File POS

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/16/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration in support to be relieved as counsel

7/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration in support to be relieved as counsel

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/24/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Not Found/ No Service/ Canceled

11/6/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Not Found/ No Service/ Canceled

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/20/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/20/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/1/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

7/31/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

7/31/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/31/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER JAMES HOLDSWORTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Kimberly Oberrecht (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration declaration in support to be relieved as counsel; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of OSC Re: Failure to File POS; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER JAMES HOLDSWORTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/28/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Not Found/ No Service/ Canceled; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER JAMES HOLDSWORTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OSCAR ARRIOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC00007    Hearing Date: January 16, 2020    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Oscar Arriola is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. At the prior hearing on the instant Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, the Court noted that Moving Party failed to demonstrate proof of service of the notice of continued hearing date. The Court continued the hearing and ordered Moving Party to file such proof of service at least 16 Court days prior to the new hearing date. To date, no such proof of service has been filed.

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 17STLC00007    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Oscar Arriola is CONTINUED TO JANUARY 16, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 94. MOVING PARTY IS TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE CONTINUED HEARING TO ALL PARTIES AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE SAME AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE. MOVING PARTY IS ALSO TO FILE A PROPOSED ORDER WITH THE CORRECT TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN THE MOTION BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR DENIED.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.