Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:07:48 (UTC).

OREN FIROOZ VS VII COMMERCIAL CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 OREN FIROOZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VII COMMERCIAL CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4841

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIROOZ OREN

Defendants

VII COMMERCIAL CORP.

HARRY MARKS INC.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/7/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/12/2019

11/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/12/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Richard Charlemagne appearing for defendants

11/12/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Richard Charlemagne appearing for defendants

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/14/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/14/2019

11/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/14/2019

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/14/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/12/2019 11:35 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/12/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2019 at 11:35 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/12/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Richard Charlemagne appearing for defendants; Filed by: VII COMMERCIAL CORP. (Defendant); HARRY MARKS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2019 at 11:35 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OREN FIROOZ against Defendant HARRY MARKS, INC. and Defendant VII COMMERCIAL CORP. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OREN FIROOZ on 09/19/2019 for the principal amount of $760.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $870.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: OREN FIROOZ (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY MARKS, INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OREN FIROOZ (Plaintiff); As to: VII COMMERCIAL CORP. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OREN FIROOZ (Plaintiff); As to: VII COMMERCIAL CORP. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OREN FIROOZ (Plaintiff); As to: VII COMMERCIAL CORP. (Defendant); HARRY MARKS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRY MARKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VII COMMERCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant