This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 00:38:20 (UTC).

ORE-CAL CORPORATION VS WHITE, ROGER

Case Summary

On 12/03/2015 ORE-CAL CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITE, ROGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0023

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORE-CAL CORPORATION REGISTERED OWNER

Defendants

AVIS BUDGET CORPORATION

PV HOLDING CORPORATION OWNER

ESCOBAR FRANCES DRIVER

WHITE ROGER

ESCOBAR FRANCES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS SC-130 RETURNED AS TO (ESCOBAR, FRANCES) DRIVER DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABEL AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 01A , HON. KENJI MACHIDA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT DEFENDANT AVIS BUDGET CORPORATION IS PRESENT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (PV HOLDING CORPORATION) OWNER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/21/16 . FOR (ORE-CAL CORPORATION) REGISTERED OWNER . AGAINST (WHITE, ROGER) . PRINCIPAL $ 3201.00 . COSTS $ 120.00 . TOTAL $ 3321.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (WHITE, ROGER) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PV HOLDING CORPORATION) OWNER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/21/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 01A .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AVIS BUDGET CORPORATION) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/21/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 01A .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WHITE, ROGER) , AND SERVED AS TO (WHITE, ROGER) BY SUB-SERVING SHAWN HOWELL, BUILDING MANAGEMENT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/21/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 01A . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT AS TO /D3 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT AS TO /D4 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (PV HOLDING CORPORATION) OWNER . RECEIPT # LAC403768002 . 70143490000149515603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (AVIS BUDGET CORPORATION) . RECEIPT # LAC403768002 . 70143490000149515597

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC403768002. HEARING SET FOR 01/21/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 01A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ore-Cal Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PV HOLDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVIS / BUDGET GROUP INC A CORPORATION is a litigant