This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:08:26 (UTC).

ORCUTT CORP VS BURROUGHS, CECIL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2013 ORCUTT CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURROUGHS, CECIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0175

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORCUTT CORP

Defendant

BURROUGHS CECIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISHNER, LAURENCE H.

Defendant Attorney

BURROUGHS, CECIL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2013
  • MOTION FILED: MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION HEARING SET FOR 7/02/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • MOTION FILED: OTHER HEARING SET FOR 7/02/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION POSSESSION $43.33 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/23/13, 09:00 AM, DEPT 87

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - DEFAULT AS TO 415.46. NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • MOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 3/29/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less