This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 00:41:24 (UTC).

ORANGE COAST BUILDING SERVICES, INC. VS LIBRARY COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 ORANGE COAST BUILDING SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIBRARY COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6211

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COAST BUILDING SERVICES INC.

Defendant

LIBRARY COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KURZ ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

9/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/15/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/15/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Status Conference re Arbitration

2/10/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Status Conference re Arbitration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Status of Arbitration)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Status of Arbitration)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Status of Arbitration) of 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Status of Arbitration) of 01/11/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/5/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/21/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. on 07/01/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 09/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered: Name Extension: Filed Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Library Court Community Association (Defendant) to Library Court Community Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. on 07/01/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Orange Coast Building Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2348037 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Library Court Community Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 04/15/2021 to 04/15/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 12/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Library Court Community Association (Defendant); Service Date: 07/19/2019; Service Cost: 84.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Library Court Community Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Library Court Community Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Library Court Community Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06211    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1281.2, et seq.)

 

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant’s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action is GRANTED. The matter is to be arbitrated before the AAA However, Defendant’s request for sanctions is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On July 1, 2019, Plaintiff Orange Coast Building Services, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract against Defendant Library Court Community Association (“Defendant”).

On August 19, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

“On petition of a party to an arbitration agreement alleging the existence of a written agreement to arbitrate a controversy and that a party thereto refuses to arbitrate such controversy, the court shall order the petitioner and the respondent to arbitrate the controversy if it determines that an agreement to arbitrate the controversy exists, unless it determines that: (a) The right to compel arbitration has been waived by the petitioner; or (b) Grounds exist for the revocation of the agreement.” (Code Civ. Proc., §§1281.2, subds. (a)-(b).) As with other types of agreements, “[t]he failure of the [party] to carefully read the agreement and the amendment is not a reason to refuse to enforce the arbitration provisions.” (Powers v. Dickson, Carlson & Campillo (1997) 54 Cal.App.4th 1102, 1115.) “California law, ‘like [federal law], reflects a strong policy favoring arbitration agreements and requires close judicial scrutiny of waiver claims.’” (Wagner Const. Co. v. Pacific Mechanical Corp. (2007) 41 Cal.4th 19, 31.) If the court orders arbitration, then the court shall stay the action until arbitration is completed. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 1281.4.)

  1. Discussion

Defendant brings the instant Motion seeking to compel Plaintiff to submit to arbitration based on a Construction Agreement (the “Agreement”) entered into by the parties on or about May 23, 2018. (Mot., p. 3, Exh. A.) The Agreement contains an arbitration provision stating that “[a]ny controversy or claim arising out of or related to [the] Agreement, or breach thereof, shall be resolved by binding arbitration administered by the American Arbitration Association (‘AAA’) in accordance with AAA’s construction industry arbitration rules, and judgment on the award rendered by the arbitrator(s) may be entered in any court having jurisdiction thereof…” (Id., Exh. A, p. 9, ¶ 10.) Plaintiff has not submitted an opposition to the instant Motion. Accordingly, Defendant has demonstrated the existence of an arbitration agreement and the Court finds that there is no defense to its enforcement.

Defendant also requests sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of attorney’s fees incurred in moving to compel arbitration pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 128.5, subdivision (a). (Mot., p. 6.)

However, motions for sanctions under Section 128.5 must be requested by a separate motion. (Code Civ. Proc., § 128.5, subd. (f)(1)(A).) In addition, the party seeking sanctions under Section 128.5 must serve a copy of the motion on the opposite party at least 21 days before filing with the Court to allow that party to withdraw or correct the challenged pleading or motion. (Code Civ. Proc., § 128.5, subd. (f)(1)(B).) As Defendant has not demonstrated compliance with these requirements, its request for sanctions is DENIED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant’s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action is GRANTED. The matter is to be arbitrated before the AAA. However, Defendant’s request for sanctions is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COAST BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant