This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:59:09 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS YONATAN BERMUDEZ MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YONATAN BERMUDEZ MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5872

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

BERMUDEZ MARTINEZ YONATAN

South Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/14/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/7/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/7/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/14/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/14/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/14/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/14/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Yonatan Bermudez Martinez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 11/14/2018 for the principal amount of $895.61 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $980.61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/07/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yonatan Bermudez Martinez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/07/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yonatan Bermudez Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less