This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 01:48:11 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS YENSY JUDY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YENSY JUDY GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3805

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

GARCIA YENSY JUDY

Los Angeles, CA 90001

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/19/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/5/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/05/2019

2/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/05/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/11/2018

10/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/11/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/3/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/03/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/05/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/05/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/05/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/05/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yensy Judy Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/13/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Status Date changed from 08/22/2018 to 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Yensy Judy Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less