This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 01:32:01 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS VICTOR ALFONSO BRITO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICTOR ALFONSO BRITO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4795

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

BRITO VICTOR ALFONSO

Cudahy, CA 90201

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/14/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

7/15/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

3/25/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/20/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/11/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/11/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/15/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/25/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/25/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ - Return: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (los angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 473.95; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: victor Alfonso Brito (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 06/14/2019 ; Status Date changed from 12/11/2018 to 06/14/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 473.95; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAddress for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAddress for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/11/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant victor Alfonso Brito on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 09/25/2018 for the principal amount of $388.95 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $473.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: victor Alfonso Brito (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: victor Alfonso Brito (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less