This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 01:00:02 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS SYLVIA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SYLVIA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5949

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

GOMEZ SYLVIA

Santa Fe Sprin, CA 90670

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/28/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2019

2/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/26/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Sylvia Gomez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 11/20/2018 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $2,605.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/28/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sylvia Gomez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/03/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/26/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sylvia Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.