This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2019 at 00:28:27 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS STEPHANIE GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHANIE GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0424

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146,

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

GUTIERREZ STEPHANIE

El Monte, CA 91732

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018

5/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/9/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/9/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/13/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/24/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/24/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/24/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/09/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Stephanie Gutierrez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 01/24/2018 for the principal amount of $334.82 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $429.82.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/09/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/09/2018 08:30 AM at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/09/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stephanie Gutierrez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/06/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stephanie Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.