Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 00:25:14 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS SHEENA WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEENA WRIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0667

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

WRIGHT SHEENA

Lynwood, CA 90262

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/19/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/19/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2019 and Notice of Entry of Judgment

4/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2019 and Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/4/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2019 and Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 04/19/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Sheena Wright on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $150.00 for a total of $2,650.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sheena Wright (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sheena Wright (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant