Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 01:11:47 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS RICARDO JAUREGUI GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO JAUREGUI GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3173

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

JAUREGUI GOMEZ RICARDO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/18/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Jauregui Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less