Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2019 at 13:07:04 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS RAFAEL FLETES PACHECO

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAFAEL FLETES PACHECO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1456

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

FLETES PACHECO RAFAEL

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/7/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/7/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/07/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/07/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Rafael Fletes Pacheco on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019 for the principal amount of $541.19 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $621.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael Fletes Pacheco (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rafael Fletes Pacheco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant