Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 04:34:55 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS PEDRO JOSE ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEDRO JOSE ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3182

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

ORTIZ PEDRO JOSE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/16/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/4/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/18/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/11/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pedro Jose Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less