Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 00:12:55 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS PAULA ALEJANDRA CASTELLANOS PORTILLO

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAULA ALEJANDRA CASTELLANOS PORTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0838

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

CASTELLANOS PORTILLO PAULA ALEJANDRA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/12/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to Paula Alejandra Castellanos Portillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Paula Alejandra Castellanos Portillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Paula Alejandra Castellanos Portillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant