This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:47:42 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS MIGUEL ANGEL VARGAS

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIGUEL ANGEL VARGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5983

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

VARGAS MIGUEL ANGEL

Whittier, CA 90604

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/20/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/27/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

1/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 11/20/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the request by the Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/20/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Angel Vargas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/03/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/27/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Angel Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less