This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 09:45:15 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS MARIA DE LOURDES NAVA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIA DE LOURDES NAVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0463

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

NAVA MARIA DE LOURDES

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

5/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

2/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 02/13/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to Maria De Lourdes Nava

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Lourdes Nava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/30/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Lourdes Nava (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Lourdes Nava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.