Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2019 at 13:05:44 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS LILIAN GODINEZ

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LILIAN GODINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1450

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

GODINEZ LILIAN

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/5/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the request of the Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/05/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Lilian Godinez (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Lilian Godinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant