This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 01:47:24 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS LIBIA ZULEMA AHUMADA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBIA ZULEMA AHUMADA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3832

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

AHUMADA GARCIA LIBIA ZULEMA

Los Angeles, CA 90063

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2019

2/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019

2/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2018

10/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2018

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/7/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/07/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/14/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/14/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Libia Zulema Ahumada Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Libia Zulema Ahumada Garcia (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Libia Zulema Ahumada Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less