This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 01:29:50 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS JULIO CESAR HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIO CESAR HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3887

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

HERNANDEZ JULIO CESAR

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/15/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/28/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/12/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sacramento)

7/15/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sacramento)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/7/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • Writ of Execution (Sacramento); Issued by: Clerk; County: Sacramento; Principal: 380.34; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Hernandez (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 300.00; Service Date: 07/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Address for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) customer request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Address for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) customer request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/15/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Julio Cesar Hernandez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/07/2018 for the principal amount of $595.34 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $680.34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Hernandez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/23/18; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less