This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 00:23:20 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS JUAN RICO VERA

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN RICO VERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5960

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

RICO VERA JUAN

Los Angeles, CA 90001

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2019

8/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/30/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/30/2019

5/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/30/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2019

2/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2019

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/31/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/2/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/30/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/26/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Rico Vera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.