This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 00:54:12 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS JUAN JOSE VELAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN JOSE VELAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5008

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

VELAZQUEZ JUAN JOSE

Maywood, CA 90270

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/25/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/3/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/20/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/14/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 10/03/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to The plaintiffs request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/14/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • Pursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/25/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jose Velazquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.