This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2020 at 07:49:10 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS JOAQUIN OLIVARES

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOAQUIN OLIVARES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0843

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

OLIVARES JOAQUIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/15/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/23/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/17/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/15/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/24/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 02/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/16/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2020 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/08/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Joaquin Olivares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant