Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 09:51:32 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS HUMBERTO MERCADO CARRILLO

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUMBERTO MERCADO CARRILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3265

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

MERCADO CARRILLO HUMBERTO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2019

6/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 06/05/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Mercado Carrillo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/26/19; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Mercado Carrillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant