This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 01:52:57 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS HUMBERTO FRANCISCO FIRMAN

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUMBERTO FRANCISCO FIRMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5962

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

FIRMAN HUMBERTO FRANCISCO

6933 Mountain View Ave Apt E

Huntington Par, CA 90255

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/27/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/4/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

1/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Humberto Francisco Firman on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 11/20/2018 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $2,605.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/27/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Francisco Firman (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/27/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Francisco Firman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.