This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2019 at 00:50:49 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS HEZZRAEL SAUCEDO ALARCON

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HEZZRAEL SAUCEDO ALARCON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3804

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

SAUCEDO ALARCON HEZZRAEL

Huntington Par, CA 90255

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/24/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/27/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/27/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/31/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/30/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/30/2018

11/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/30/2018

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/7/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/3/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/3/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Hezzrael Saucedo Alarcon (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/24/2019 ; Status Date changed from 03/27/2019 to 04/24/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. against Defendant Hezzrael Saucedo Alarcon on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/03/2018 for the principal amount of $980.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $1,085.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/27/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNotice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Hezzrael Saucedo Alarcon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/27/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Hezzrael Saucedo Alarcon (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Hezzrael Saucedo Alarcon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less