This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 08:52:23 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS ESTEBAN LUNA RIOS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESTEBAN LUNA RIOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0474

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

LUNA RIOS ESTEBAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2020

3/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

2/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • Hearing08/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/14/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/02/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/30/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Esteban Luna Rios (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less