Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 01:21:13 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS ELIDA M PORTILLO

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIDA M PORTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A. MCSORLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0465

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

PORTILLO ELIDA M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

4/21/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/2/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/25/2020

3/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/25/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/18/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: Elida M Portillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) to Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Elida M Portillo (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/25/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert A. McSorley in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Elida M Portillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less