Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 00:12:21 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS DEICY MARTINA CASTELLANOS MEJIA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEICY MARTINA CASTELLANOS MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0677

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

CASTELLANOS MEJIA DEICY MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Deicy Martina Castellanos Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant