This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 04:06:23 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS DANIEL DEL REFUGIO ABURTO

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL DEL REFUGIO ABURTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4158

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

DEL REFUGIO ABURTO DANIEL

Los Angeles, CA 90011

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/10/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/25/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/25/2019

2/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/25/2019

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/31/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/31/2018

10/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/31/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/21/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant) to Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/21/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Oportun Inc. as to Daniel Del Refugio Aburto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/25/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/28/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/25/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/07/18; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Del Refugio Aburto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less