This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 01:14:13 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS CONNIE MARIE COLVIN

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CONNIE MARIE COLVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1545

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

COLVIN CONNIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/17/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/13/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2020

8/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/17/2020: Attachment - Attachment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 03/25/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the courts order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 08/10/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/10/2020 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Connie Marie Colvin (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/13/2020; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/10/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Connie Marie Colvin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant