This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:51:27 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS CLAUDIA IVON MAGALLANES CARRANZA

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLAUDIA IVON MAGALLANES CARRANZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0225

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

MAGALLANES CARRANZA CLAUDIA IVON

Huntington Par, CA 90255

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/20/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

3/25/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/15/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2018

4/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Writ of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 969.77; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Address for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Address for Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/15/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Claudia Ivon Magallanes Carranza (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/29/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Claudia Ivon Magallanes Carranza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less