This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:09:40 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS ANTONIO JIMENEZ VILLANUEVA

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANTONIO JIMENEZ VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3833

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Po Box 2146

Menlo Park, CA 94026

Defendant

JIMENEZ VILLANUEVA ANTONIO

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2019

2/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/19/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/10/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/10/2018

10/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/10/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/10/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/27/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/7/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/7/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. on 08/07/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to request of the Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/04/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Antonio Jimenez Villanueva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/04/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Hearing - Other Reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/04/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Jimenez Villanueva (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Jimenez Villanueva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less