Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 10:34:10 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS YESENIA RIVERA TAPIA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YESENIA RIVERA TAPIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1460

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

RIVERA TAPIA YESENIA

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/9/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/9/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/11/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Rivera Tapia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant