This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2017 at 09:11:26 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS RIGOBERTO NARES RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIGOBERTO NARES RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0187

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendants

NARES RODRIGUEZ RIGOBERTO

RODRIGUEZ RIGOBERTO NARES

Pomona, CA 91768

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 05/08/2017

5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Diana Chavarria

5/8/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Diana Chavarria

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/4/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/4/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mariana Echeverria

3/10/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mariana Echeverria

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/10/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

[Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

3/10/2017: [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Diana Chavarria; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mariana Echeverria; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Updated -- Rigoberto Nares Rodriguez (Defendant): Last Name changed from Nares Rodriguez to Rodriguez; Middle Name: Nares

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Rigoberto Nares Rodriguez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170105E7235 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170105E7235 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Rigoberto Nares Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant