This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2018 at 18:59:54 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS OFFMAN EDUARDO HERNANDEZ PEREZ

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OFFMAN EDUARDO HERNANDEZ PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1436

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250,

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

HERNANDEZ PEREZ OFFMAN EDUARDO

Palmdale, CA 93550

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/8/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]

10/12/2017: [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]

Unknown

10/12/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

9/8/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

9/8/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/8/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/08/2017 08:30 AM at Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 11/08/2017 08:30 AM at 11/08/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Offman Eduardo Hernandez Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.