This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:07:29 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS MIREYA DANIELA GARCIA SERRATO

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIREYA DANIELA GARCIA SERRATO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL SMALL and ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0185

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL SMALL

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

831 N Hacienda Blvd

La Puente, CA 91744

Defendant

GARCIA SERRATO MIREYA DANIELA

Azusa, CA 91702

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/2/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/2/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/20/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/12/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Writ - Return

7/2/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

12/18/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/02/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. against Defendant Mireya Daniela Garcia Serrato on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $1,087.18 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,182.18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: Mireya Daniela Garcia Serrato (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E9385 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E9385 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael Small at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: Mireya Daniela Garcia Serrato (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less