This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 18:14:33 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS MARTIN LEONEL PAEZ PARTIDA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN LEONEL PAEZ PARTIDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0483

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

PAEZ PARTIDA MARTIN LEONEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Luz Langarica

5/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Luz Langarica

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/1/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 03/21/2017

3/21/2017: Minute Order of 03/21/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daniel Flores

3/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daniel Flores

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Martin Leonel Paez Partida on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 01/17/2017 for the principal amount of $677.58 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $762.58.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Luz Langarica; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Daniel Flores; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Leonel Paez Partida (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170118E1493 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170118E1493 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Leonel Paez Partida (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant