This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 at 09:27:10 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS MARIA LUISA NAVARRETE

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIA LUISA NAVARRETE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3183

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

NAVARRETE MARIA LUISA

Culver City, CA 90230

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/16/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/16/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017

8/16/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

6/21/2017: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/21/2017

6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/16/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to Petioner's request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Luisa Navarrete (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E9297 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E9297 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Luisa Navarrete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less