This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:07:16 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS MA ZENAIDA MADERA RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MA ZENAIDA MADERA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0197

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

12727 Sherman Way

North Hollywoo, CA 91605

Defendant

RAMIREZ MA ZENAIDA MADERA

Van Nuys, CA 91405

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/29/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/8/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/8/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 08/08/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. against Defendant MA ZENAIDA MADERA RAMIREZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $1,070.30 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $1,155.30.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to defendant Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Sub Service to Cristina Solis - Co occupant; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: MA ZENAIDA MADERA RAMIREZ (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E0763 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E0763 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: MA ZENAIDA MADERA RAMIREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less