This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 08:08:41 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JULIO ERNESTO MONTENEGRO

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIO ERNESTO MONTENEGRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5542

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250,

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

MONTENEGRO JULIO ERNESTO

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/30/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2018

1/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - OPORTUN INC.

10/31/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - OPORTUN INC.

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

10/31/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/31/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice - Continuance

9/11/2017: Notice - Continuance

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Zayra Lopez

9/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Zayra Lopez

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice Continuance]

9/11/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice Continuance]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

9/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

9/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/1/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/18/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

7/18/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/18/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/30/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/30/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A Held - Continued to 01/30/2018 08:30 AM at 01/30/2018 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department A Held - Continued to 01/30/2018 08:30 AM at 01/30/2018 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department NE2 to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Zayra Lopez; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170718E9424 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170718E9424 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Ernesto Montenegro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less