This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 18:04:55 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JOSE MANFREDY MEDINA BENITEZ

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE MANFREDY MEDINA BENITEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4292

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

MEDINA BENITEZ JOSE MANFREDY

Pasadena, CA 91103

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

1/12/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mariana Echeverria

1/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mariana Echeverria

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/3/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order of 01/03/2017

1/3/2017: Minute Order of 01/03/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/1/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Address for Jose Manfredy Medina Benitez (Defendant) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 01/03/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 03/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mariana Echeverria; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Manfredy Medina Benitez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2016; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1161102E9428 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161102E9428 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Manfredy Medina Benitez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant